Alter, Chester M., 1906-2006
Biography
University of Denver Chancellor Emeritus Chester M. Alter passed away March 6, in Santa Fe, N. M. ... Born March 21, 1906, on a farm in Rush County, Ind.
Biography
Chester M. Alter Chancellor, 1953-1966.
Sources
Breck, A.D. (1996). From the rockies to the world (pg. 155); Board of Trustees Minutes – Volume P: page 183.
Biography
Chancellor Alter retires in 1966.
Sources
“Chancellor Alter to Retire,” The University of Denver Clarion, vol. 70, no. 58, June 3, 1966, 1.
Biography
In 1975,a Colloquium honors former Chancellor Alter.
Biography
Chancellor Alter welcomes US Air Academy to DU (October 1955).
Biography
Announces Tuition Hike at DU (1956).
Biography
Announces New Law School and Dorm (1956).
Biography
Crowns Elaine Petersen as Homecoming Queen (1956).
Biography
Named to the Commission on International Cooperation Through Education of the Association of American Colleges.
Biography
Issues Official Women’s Week Proclamation (1957).
Biography
Awarding Yul Brynner on February 14, 1957, for his outstanding contributions to the theater and arts.
Biography
Discusses widespread interest in education (1957).
Biography
To speak at Traditional Vespers (1957).
Biography
Welcomes Newcomers to DU (September 1957).
Biography
In the Denver Clarion February 18, 1958 issue, the Chancellor calls for scientists and lawyers to work together in solving legal problems involving space travel, atomic energy, radiation and manmade climate, in an address before the 1958 Judicial Conference in Colorado Springs.
Biography
Elected Denver Rotary President - term of office from July 1, 1958 - July 1, 1959.
Biography
"Our Unpublished Opinions" was the topic of the Baccalaureate address given at the Baccalaureate Vespers on June 5, 1958.
Biography
Elected President of the Association of Urban Universitites (1958).
Biography
States that tuition increase is a rumor (1959).
Biography
Extending congratulations to award winners during Engineer's Day (1959).
Biography
Discusses quality fctor in student selection at 1959 Founder's Day Banquet.
Biography
To receive an Honorary Degree from Boston Universtity (1959).
Biography
Gives welcome to students at convocation (1960).
Biography
Tells of $5 Million Grant to Denver U by Ford Foundation in New York.
Biography
Announces $251,000 Given University by Denver Citizens Following Ford Foundation Grant (1960).
Biography
Will give a welcom speech to the Campus Conference on Religion (1960).
Biography
Announces Phipps Ten Acre Belcaro Park Estate Given DU by Former Senators Wife Will Ultimately be Conference Center.
Biography
Proposes Plans for Ford Grant to be Used in Academic Aim (1960).
Biography
Announces Michigan State Professor (Dr. Ralph D. Wilson) is New HRM School Director (1960).
Biography
Announces that the Board of Trustees of DU voted unanimously to terminate participation in intercollegiate football, effective immediately (January 10, 1961).
Biography
Discusses why the Nursing School was dropped from the University (1961).
Biography
Gives New Student Welcome (1961).
Biography
Announces in 1961 a three-year, $25 Million Program, for new resources for the University - the largest in the 97-year history of the University.
Biography
Announces Safety Campaign (1961).
Biography
Receives a letter from President Lyndon B Johnson (September 24, 1964), asking him to choose an outstanding student leader on campus that can be sent to the White House.
Biography
At the grounbreaking ceremonies for the Graduate School of International Studies (GSIS) 1965.
Biography
Announces Retirement in 1966 - held Chancellor position since 1953. Decided to begin a leave of absence August 1, 1966 and retire no later than June 15, 1967. Dr. Wilbur Miller was named to fill his post until a new Chief is selected.
Found in 34 Collections and/or Records:
University of Denver (Colorado Seminary) Commencement Program, 1961 August 18
Program for the University of Denver undergraduate, graduate and doctoral commencement ceremony, August Eighteenth, 1961 at Ten o'clock. Honorary degree recipient: Horace Jay Wubben, Doctor of Laws. Conferring of degrees: Chancellor Chester M. Alter.
University of Denver (Colorado Seminary) Commencement Program, 1962 June 8
Program for the University of Denver undergraduate, graduate and doctoral commencement ceremony, June Eighth,1962 at Seven-thirty o'clock. Honorary degree recipients: William Henry Bernhardt, Doctor of Laws; Frank Haorld Hanna Roberts, Doctor of Laws; Henry King Stanford, Doctor of Laws. Conferring of degrees: Chancellor Chester M. Alter.
University of Denver (Colorado Seminary) Commencement Program, 1962 August 17
Program for the University of Denver undergraduate, graduate and doctoral commencement ceremony, August Seventeenth, 1962 at Ten o'clock. Honorary degree recipients: Fred Edmund D'Amour, Doctor of Laws; Ruth Murray Underhill, Doctor of Laws. Conferring of degrees: Chancellor Chester M. Alter.
University of Denver (Colorado Seminary) Commencement Program, 1963 June 7
University of Denver (Colorado Seminary) Commencement Program, 1963 August 16
Program for the University of Denver undergraduate, graduate and doctoral commencement ceremony, August 16, 1963 at Ten o'clock. Honorary degree recipients: Muhammad Zafrulla Khan, Doctor of Laws, former president of the General Assembly of the United Nations. John Arthur Love, Doctor of Laws, holder of two degrees from the University of Denver (BA '38, LLB '41). Chester M. Alter, Chancellor of the University.
University of Denver (Colorado Seminary) Commencement Program, 1964 August 14
Program for the University of Denver undergraduate, graduate and doctoral Commencement ceremony, August 14, 1964 at Ten o'clock. Honorary degree recipients: Andrew Wellington Cordier, Doctor of Laws. Conferring of degrees: Chester M. Alter, Chancellor of the University.